DE HB125 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 15 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 of this bill establishes the crimes of possession of an unfinished firearm frame or receiver with no serial number, possession of and manufacturing a covert or undetectable firearm, possession of and manufacturing an untraceable firearm, and manufacturing or distributing a firearm using a three-dimensional printer. This bill also makes it a crime to possess a firearm frame or receiver with a removed, obliterated, or altered serial number. This bill makes very limited exceptions to the requirement that certain guns have serial numbers which are: (1) Firearms manufactured before 1968; (2) Muzzle loaders that only use black powder, and antique replicas. Finally, this bill makes clear that ยง 1463 of Title 11 concerning untraceable firearms does not apply to members of the military forces or members of a police force in this State duly authorized to carry an untraceable firearm, and does not apply to the manufacture or importation for sale to a law-enforcement or military entity in this State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO
2021-06-15 Amendment SA 1 to HB 125 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 8 YES 13 NO
2021-06-15 Amendment SA 1 to HB 125 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-10 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2021-05-20 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
2021-05-20 Passed By House. Votes: 23 YES 18 NO
2021-05-20 Amendment HA 2 to HB 125 - Defeated By House. Votes: 18 YES 23 NO
2021-05-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 125 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-05-17 Amendment HA 2 to HB 125 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-04-21 Amendment HA 1 to HB 125 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-03-16 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-03-11 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback