DE HB123 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act would require the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to obtain the consent of the General Assembly before promulgating any regulations restricting the sale of fuel-powered cars, trucks, and SUVs in Delaware. This Act does not change the emission standards fuel-powered vehicles must currently meet. The provisions of this bill would be retroactive to March 1, 2023.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Natural Resources And Environmental Control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2023-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 21 YES 20 NO | |
2023-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2023-06-30 | Re-Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2023-06-08 | Not Enough Signatures to Release | |
2023-04-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House |