DE HB122 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act updates and streamlines the State Nutrient Management Program within the Department of Agriculture. It expands and clarifies information required to be included in the Nutrient Management Plan, including, among other things:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Nutrient Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-01-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 5 Favorable | |
2023-05-04 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2023-05-04 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2023-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 7 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2023-04-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |