DE HB122 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is called the Jamie Wolfe Employment Act in recognition of Jamie Wolfe, a powerful disability rights advocate who worked tirelessly on behalf of people with disabilities for equal rights and equal access to education, housing, competitive and integrated employment, transportation and community-based services.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Employment Of And Wages Payable To Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-23 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING | |
2021-06-23 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 122 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-21 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 122 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-03-31 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-03-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |