DE HB116 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill was recommended by the Executive Order 45 Re-Entry Education Task Force. That task force was created to examine the present system and to make recommendations on how to best serve youth educationally as they leave juvenile justice secure facilities. This bill would make the DSCYF Education Unit a Local Education Agency for very limited purposes. Specifically, the bill would allow DSCYF Education Unit teachers to apply for federal, state, or private loan forgiveness programs available to educators who work in a Local Education Agency. It would also allow the DSCYF Education Unit to apply for federal, state, or private grants that are made available to Local Education Agencies and allow the Education Unit to issue credits to youth who finish classes while they are in our care and educated by the Unit.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Services For Children, Youth And Their Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |