DE HB108 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 of this bill amends the Charter of the Town of Milton relating to purchasing contracts. Specifically, the bill: raises the monetary thresholds to be more in line with the State of Delaware, Material and Non-Professional Service Purchase Thresholds, known as policy 5.3.1; clarifies that the Town need not competitively bid again if the results were unreasonable or not independently reached; and adds a new exclusion for purchases made pursuant to the State of Delaware procurement process or from a vendor on the General Services Administration Federal Supply Schedule.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Milton Relating To Contracts And Enumeration Of Powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-24 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |