DE HB105 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Step therapy protocols are a mechanism by which health insurance companies require patients to try one or more prescriptions drugs before coverage is provided for the actual drug prescribed by the patients health care provider. This Act creates a Step Therapy Exception Process whereby patients who are required by their insurance company to go through step therapy protocols can, under certain circumstances, bypass step therapy to obtain the initially-prescribed medication. This Act does not apply to state or federal governmental plans.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Insurance Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-09 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2019-05-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-17 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 105, and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |