DE HB100 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This substitute bill, which makes only technical changes to the original bill, creates a special license plate for the Delaware State Police which will be displayed on the active fleet at the discretion of the Superintendent of the State Police for the 100th Anniversary of the Division.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special License Plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-04-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-03-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2023-03-09 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2023-03-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-03-08 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 100 |