DE HB100 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes a new tax rate ceiling for the next two years and then sunsets to its original level in year three. Also this Act limits total enrollment over the next three years and provides limitations on applicant selection.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Tax Rate And Enrollment For The Sussex County Vocational-technical High School District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 1 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 12 On Its Merits |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |