DC PR25-0938 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Resolution R25-0636, Effective from Sep 17, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 011568
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Resolution R25-0636, Effective from Sep 17, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 011568
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2025 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond and General Obligation and Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Emergency Approval Resolution of 2024
Title
Fiscal Year 2025 Income Tax Secured Revenue Bond, General Obligation Bond and General Obligation and Income Tax Secured Bond Anticipation Note Issuance Authorization Emergency Approval Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Council | Resolution R25-0636, Effective from Sep 17, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 011568 |
2024-09-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-09-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |