DC PR25-0657 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Preservation Review Board Gabrielle Miller Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Historic Preservation Review Board Gabrielle Miller Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-03-26 | Council | Withdrawn |
2024-03-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0657 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0657 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54849/Introduction/PR25-0657-Introduction.pdf |