DC PR25-0637 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Director of the Department of Small and Local Business Development Rosemary Suggs-Evans Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Director of the Department of Small and Local Business Development Rosemary Suggs-Evans Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-04-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2024-02-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0637 Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0637 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54777/Introduction/PR25-0637-Introduction.pdf |