DC PR25-0543 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Judicial Nomination Commission Marie Johns Reappointment Resolution of 2023
Title
District of Columbia Judicial Nomination Commission Marie Johns Reappointment Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-02-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0412 |
2024-02-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-01-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0543 |
2024-01-10 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-01-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-21 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-12-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-12-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-12-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0543 Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-11-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |