DC PR25-0471 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Resolution R25-0315, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001491
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Buildings Strategic Enforcement Administrator Keith Parsons Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Buildings Strategic Enforcement Administrator Keith Parsons Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-09CouncilResolution R25-0315, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001491
2023-12-12CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2023-11-07CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R25-0315
2023-11-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-11-07CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR25-0471
2023-10-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-10-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-10-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2023-10-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR25-0471 Published in the DC Register
2023-10-05CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-10-03CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback