DC PR25-0234 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Resolution R25-0147, Effective from May 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 007683
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Resolution R25-0147, Effective from May 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 007683
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Milestone Therapeutic Services, Inc. Purchase Orders Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Milestone Therapeutic Services, Inc. Purchase Orders Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Council - Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Council - Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Council | Resolution R25-0147, Effective from May 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 007683 |
2023-05-16 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0147 |
2023-05-16 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-05-16 | Council | Amendment |
2023-05-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-05-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |