DC PR25-0227 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Massage Therapy Cary Bland Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Title
Board of Massage Therapy Cary Bland Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-05-31 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-05-30 | Council | Withdrawn |
2023-05-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0227 Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-04-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0227 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52954/Introduction/PR25-0227-Introduction.pdf |