DC PR25-0125 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-03-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0078, Effective from Mar 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 003300 |
2023-03-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0078 |
2023-03-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-03-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |