DC PR24-0918 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Resolution R24-0618, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011964
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Resolution R24-0618, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011964
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of For Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Department of For Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-07 | Council | Resolution R24-0618, Effective from Sep 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011964 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-09-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0618 |
2022-09-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |