DC PR24-0834 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Resolution R24-0539, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Resolution R24-0539, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CleanEnergy DC Omnibus Technical Amendment Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
CleanEnergy DC Omnibus Technical Amendment Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-15 | Council | Resolution R24-0539, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008424 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0539 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |