DC PR24-0814 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-18 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0644
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-18 - Approved with Resolution Number R24-0644
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council on the Stoddert Elementary Addition Resolution of 2022
Title
Sense of the Council on the Stoddert Elementary Addition Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0644 |
2022-10-18 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-09-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0814 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-06-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |