DC PR24-0790 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Resolution R24-0534, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008421
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Resolution R24-0534, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008421
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2020-LRSP-12A Approval Resolution of 2022
Title
Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2020-LRSP-12A Approval Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-15 | Council | Resolution R24-0534, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008421 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0534 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0790 Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |