DC PR24-0712 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Resolution R24-0452, Effective from May 03, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 005113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Resolution R24-0452, Effective from May 03, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 005113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Green Finance Authority Board Quorum Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Green Finance Authority Board Quorum Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Council | Resolution R24-0452, Effective from May 03, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 005113 |
2022-05-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0452 |
2022-05-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-05-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-05-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |