DC PR24-0538 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Resolution R24-0360, Effective from Jan 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000258
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Resolution R24-0360, Effective from Jan 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000258
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development Limited Grant-Making Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development Limited Grant-Making Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | Council | Resolution R24-0360, Effective from Jan 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000258 |
2022-01-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0360 |
2022-01-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-01-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |