DC PR24-0286 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Resolution R24-0156, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Resolution R24-0156, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Activity Fund Theatrical and Music Performance Expenditures Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Student Activity Fund Theatrical and Music Performance Expenditures Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Council | Resolution R24-0156, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006813 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0156 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |