DC PR24-0262 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Resolution R24-0163, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006960
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Resolution R24-0163, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006960
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fidelity in Compliance of Contracting and Procurement Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Fidelity in Compliance of Contracting and Procurement Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Council | Resolution R24-0163, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006960 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0163 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-06-01 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of CM McDuffie |
2021-06-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |