DC PR24-0221 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution R24-0105, Effective from May 18, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Resolution R24-0105, Effective from May 18, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council for Meeting the Ozone National Ambient Air Quality Standards Resolution of 2021
Title
Sense of the Council for Meeting the Ozone National Ambient Air Quality Standards Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Council | Resolution R24-0105, Effective from May 18, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005608 |
2021-05-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0105 |
2021-05-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-05-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0221 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-04-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |