DC PR24-0140 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution R24-0081, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 004188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution R24-0081, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 004188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council Condemning Hate Crimes Against Asian and Pacific Islander Americans Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Sense of the Council Condemning Hate Crimes Against Asian and Pacific Islander Americans Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Council | Resolution R24-0081, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 004188 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0081 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-04-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |