DC PR24-0062 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Resolution R24-0058, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 003904
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Resolution R24-0058, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 003904
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Service Commission Emile Thompson Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Public Service Commission Emile Thompson Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Council | Resolution R24-0058, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 003904 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0058 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-03-31 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-03-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0062 |
2021-03-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-03-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-08 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-02-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-02-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-02-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0062 Published in the DC Register |
2021-02-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-01-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |