DC PR24-0031 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Resolution R24-0015, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001380
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Resolution R24-0015, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001380
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeland Security Fusion Center and Law Enforcement Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Homeland Security Fusion Center and Law Enforcement Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Council | Resolution R24-0015, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001380 |
2021-01-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0015 |
2021-01-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-01-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |