DC PR23-1018 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public Service Commission Lorna John Confirmation Resolution of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Commission Lorna John Confirmation Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-03CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2020-11-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-11-23CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-11-20CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2020-11-20CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2020-11-19CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-11-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-11-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-1018 Published in the DC Register
2020-11-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2020-11-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback