DC PR23-1013 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Enrollment Preference Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Child Enrollment Preference Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-24 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-20 | Council | Resolution R23-0595, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13520 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0595 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-11-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |