DC PR23-0992 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Resolution R23-0582, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13461
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Resolution R23-0582, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13461
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. DCAM-15-AE-0158 and Change Order Nos. 1, 3 and 5 with Cox Graae + Spack Architects, P.C. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Contract No. DCAM-15-AE-0158 and Change Order Nos. 1, 3 and 5 with Cox Graae + Spack Architects, P.C. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | Council | Resolution R23-0582, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13461 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0582 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-10-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |