DC PR23-0990 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Resolution R23-0602, Effective from Dec 01, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Resolution R23-0602, Effective from Dec 01, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council to Declare Racism A Public Health Crisis in the District of Columbia Resolution of 2020
Title
Sense of the Council to Declare Racism A Public Health Crisis in the District of Columbia Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | Council | Resolution R23-0602, Effective from Dec 01, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14606 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0602 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0990 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-10-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2020-10-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0990 Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |