DC PR23-0891 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Resolution R23-0500, Effective from Jul 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9700
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Resolution R23-0500, Effective from Jul 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9700
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Low Income Housing Tax Credit TOPA Exemption for Transfers of Interest Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Low Income Housing Tax Credit TOPA Exemption for Transfers of Interest Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-14 | Council | Resolution R23-0500, Effective from Jul 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9700 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0500 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |