DC PR23-0832 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Resolution R23-0453, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8772
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Resolution R23-0453, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8772
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Black Lives Matter Plaza Designation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Black Lives Matter Plaza Designation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Council | Resolution R23-0453, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8772 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0453 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-06-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |