DC PR23-0830 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Resolution R23-0449, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Resolution R23-0449, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. CW59303 with MVS, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Modifications to Contract No. CW59303 with MVS, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Council | Resolution R23-0449, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9015 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0449 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-06-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |