DC PR23-0825 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Connected Transportation Network Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Connected Transportation Network Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-06-19CouncilResolution R23-0429, Effective from Jun 09, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 7741
2020-06-09CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0429
2020-06-09CouncilFinal Reading
2020-06-08CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback