DC PR23-0822 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Resolution R23-0492, Effective from Jul 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9957
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Resolution R23-0492, Effective from Jul 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9957
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2021 Local Budget Act Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Fiscal Year 2021 Local Budget Act Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Postponed to July 23, 2020 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Postponed to July 23, 2020 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Council | Resolution R23-0492, Effective from Jul 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9957 |
2020-07-23 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0492 |
2020-07-23 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-21 | Council | Postponed to July 23, 2020 |
2020-06-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-05-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |