DC PR23-0797 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Resolution R23-0412, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5257
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Resolution R23-0412, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5257
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Bilingual Public Charter School Revenue Bonds Project Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
District of Columbia Bilingual Public Charter School Revenue Bonds Project Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | Council | Resolution R23-0412, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5257 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0412 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-05-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-04-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |