DC PR23-0789 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Resolution R23-0408, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To approve CA 23-493

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2019-LRSP-03 Approval Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15CouncilResolution R23-0408, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5121
2020-05-05CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0408
2020-05-05CouncilFinal Reading
2020-05-05CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-05-01CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0789 Published in the DC Register
2020-04-20CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback