DC PR23-0774 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-01 - Resolution R23-0400, Effective from Apr 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4691
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To approve CA 23-465.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract No. CFOPD-20-C-014, Electronic Benefit Transfer (EBT) Services Approval Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-01CouncilResolution R23-0400, Effective from Apr 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4691
2020-04-21CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0400
2020-04-21CouncilFinal Reading
2020-04-07CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-03-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0774 Published in the DC Register
2020-03-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback