DC PR23-0704 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Resolution R23-0603, Effective from Dec 01, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14611
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Resolution R23-0603, Effective from Dec 01, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14611
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council in Support of Enhanced Metro Transit Police Department Oversight Resolution of 2020
Title
Sense of the Council in Support of Enhanced Metro Transit Police Department Oversight Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | Council | Resolution R23-0603, Effective from Dec 01, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14611 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0603 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0704 |
2020-10-21 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-09-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0704 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2020-02-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |