DC PR23-0697 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution R23-0495, Effective from Jul 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9432
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Resolution R23-0495, Effective from Jul 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9432
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Council review period tolled pursuant to Bill 23-733.
Title
Commissioner of the Department of Insurance, Securities, and Banking Karima Woods Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Council | Resolution R23-0495, Effective from Jul 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9432 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0495 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-22 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0697 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2020-02-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0697 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |