DC PR23-0694 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-15 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-15 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Dr. Heran Sereke-Brhan Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Title
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Dr. Heran Sereke-Brhan Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0694 |
2020-10-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-04-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0694 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |