DC PR23-0646 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Resolution R23-0340, Effective from Feb 14, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1448
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Resolution R23-0340, Effective from Feb 14, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1448
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council Urging the District Department of Transportation to Annually Recognize Bus to Work Day Resolution of 2020
Title
Sense of the Council Urging the District Department of Transportation to Annually Recognize Bus to Work Day Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Council | Resolution R23-0340, Effective from Feb 14, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1448 |
2020-02-14 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0340 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-01-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0646 Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |