DC PR23-0565 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Resolution R23-0277 Effective from December 3, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifications To Contract No. Dcrl-2016-c-0002 With East River Family Strengthening Collaborative Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifications To Contract No. Dcrl-2016-c-0002 With East River Family Strengthening Collaborative Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-13CouncilResolution R23-0277 Effective from December 3, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16199
2019-12-03CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0277
2019-12-03CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-12-03CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-11-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback