DC PR23-0539 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-17 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-17 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Employee Relations Board Harriet Segar Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Public Employee Relations Board Harriet Segar Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Council | Withdrawn |
2019-12-11 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-11-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0539 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2019-10-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0539 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43517/Introduction/PR23-0539-Introduction.pdf |