DC PR23-0523 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Resolution R23-0305, Effective from Jan 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 301
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Resolution R23-0305, Effective from Jan 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 301
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeland Security Commission Philip McNamara Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Homeland Security Commission Philip McNamara Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Council | Resolution R23-0305, Effective from Jan 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 301 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0305 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-01-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0523 |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0523 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-10-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |