DC PR23-0462 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Resolution R23-0290 Effective from December 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16512
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

District Of Columbia Water And Sewer Authority Board Of Directors Howard Gibbs Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District Of Columbia Water And Sewer Authority Board Of Directors Howard Gibbs Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-27CouncilResolution R23-0290 Effective from December 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16512
2019-12-17CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0290
2019-12-17CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-12-11CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-12-11CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0462
2019-12-04CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-10-04CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0462 Published in the DC Register
2019-09-27CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback