DC PR23-0428 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Resolution R23-0194, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9791
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Resolution R23-0194, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9791
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Collective Bargaining Agreement between the District of Columbia Public Schools and the Council of School Officers, Local #4, American Federation of School Administrators, AFL-CIO, Emergency Approval Resolution of 2019
Title
Collective Bargaining Agreement between the District of Columbia Public Schools and the Council of School Officers, Local #4, American Federation of School Administrators, AFL-CIO, Emergency Approval Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Council | Resolution R23-0194, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9791 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0194 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-07-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |